IL HB3332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Increases the administrative fee imposed upon an employer that has been demanded or ordered by the Department of Labor, or ordered by a court, to pay wages. Imposes fees on a scale depending upon the amount of wages that are owed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WAGES PENALTY FAIL TO PAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011514Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback