IL HB3331 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Homelessness Prevention Act. Changes certain types of assistance grantees shall offer households to prevent homelessness as follows: (1) payment of a rent or mortgage arrearage (rather than payment of a rent or mortgage arrearage in an amount established as necessary to defeat the eviction or foreclosure, but shall in no event be greater than 3 months of rental or mortgage arrears); (2) payment of a security deposit (rather than payment of a rent deposit or security deposit and payment of not more than 2 months rent or mortgage payments); and (3) payment of rent or mortgage. Provides that in no case shall the total assistance for a household be greater than the equivalent of 6 months of rent or mortgage payments. Provides that, on an annual basis, a grantee's administrative costs and case management expenses shall not exceed 15% of the grant amount it receives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOUSING-GRANTS TO HOMELESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-001-000
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 017-000-000
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-08HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3107012.5New CodeSee Bill Text
310706Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback