IL HB3325 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Water District Act. Provides that a general manager of a public water district may be discharged at a meeting of the board of trustees upon a majority vote of the members present (currently, by a unanimous vote of the board of trustees). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WATER DISTRICT-GENERAL MANAGER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-001-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 015-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 020-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7037057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback