IL HB3323 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Requires a unit of local government or school district with an operating budget of $1 million or more to maintain an Internet website and post to that website, for the current calendar or fiscal year, the following information: (1) information about elected and appointed officials; (2) notice of and materials prepared for meetings; (3) procedures for requesting information from the unit of local government or school district; (4) annual budget; (5) ordinances; (6) procedures to apply for building permits and zoning variances; (7) financial reports and audits; (8) information concerning employee compensation; (9) contracts with lobbying firms; (10) taxes and fees imposed by the unit of local government or school district; (11) rules governing the award of contracts; (12) bids and contracts worth $25,000 or more; (13) a debt disclosure report; and (14) public notices. Provides that any citizen who is a resident of the unit of local government or school district may bring a mandamus or injunction action to compel the unit of local government or school district to comply with the Internet posting requirements. Limits home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a public body may satisfy its obligation to produce a copy of a public record that is published on the public body's website by providing the requester an accessible link that results in direct access to the requested record in the format in which it is maintained. Provides that Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS POSTING RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 120 | 2.03.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3323&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3323.htm |