IL HB3308 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Revenue to assist the Department of Transportation in developing and maintaining a list and map of all refueling stations that provide E85 blended fuel or biodiesel fuel. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2011 and through June 30, 2016, the Department of Transportation must include the locations of all refueling stations that provide E85 blended fuel or biodiesel fuel on maps published by the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
ALTERNATE FUELS-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2011 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2505 | 2505-735 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 4-101.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |