IL HB3303 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits sexual assault by deception if the person commits an act of sexual penetration and the person submits under the belief that the person committing the act is someone known to the victim other than the accused, and this belief is induced by pretense or concealment by the accused with the intent to induce that belief. Sexual assault by deception is a Class 3 felony.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT BY DECEPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-001 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |