IL HB3303 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that law enforcement records relating to a juvenile victim or defendant remain permanently exempt from inspection and copying. Provides that all other records shall be made available for inspection and copying after a period of 5 years from the date the record is created, unless the record is otherwise exempt from inspection and copying under another provision of the Act. Exempts from disclosure information or materials that the disclosure of which would violate a Supreme Court Rule. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-11-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-29HouseSent to the Governor
2016-11-30HousePassed Both Houses
2016-11-30HouseHouse Concurs
2016-11-30House3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2016-11-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2016-11-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-11-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-11-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2016-11-16HouseArrived in House
2016-11-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2016-11-16Senate3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-11-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
2016-11-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-11-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2016-11-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016
2016-11-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2016-11-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-11-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2016-11-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 16, 2016
2016-11-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2016-11-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-06-29SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2015
2015-05-22SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2015
2015-05-22SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
2015-05-14SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-000-000
2015-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2015-04-29SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015
2015-04-22SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2015-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2015-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2015-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2015-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2015-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2015-04-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2015-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3303&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3303sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB3303_04222015_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900HB3303_11162016_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB3303_11302016_017000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback