IL HB3302 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that, for the Chicago School District only, for complaints concerning delays and denials of special education services in the 2016-2017 or 2017-2018 school year, a complainant has no less than 2 years following the creation of the State Board of Education's compensatory education plan and notification of that plan to parents and guardians of impacted children to file a complaint if the complainant has not obtained relief through (i) the compensatory education plan, (ii) a due process claim, or (iii) mediation. Provides that the State Board's notification of its compensatory education plan to parents and guardians must include notification of the extended timeframe to file complaints under this subsection. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL ED COMPLAINTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0507
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Education; 015-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-8.02gNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3302&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3302.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3302eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3302enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0507.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3302ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3302sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3302_04112019_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3302_05232019_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3302sam001_05302019_029000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback