IL HB3301 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who make a qualified donation of a crop to a food bank or other charitable organization in Illinois. Provides that the amount of the credit shall be 15% of the value of the quantity of the crop donated. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CROP DONATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3301&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3301.htm |