IL HB3299 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that a person admitted to a developmental disability facility and receiving habilitation shall have access to sex education, related resources, and treatment planning that supports his or her right to sexual health and healthy sexual practices and to be free from sexual exploitation and abuse. Provides that the person receiving habilitation shall be assessed: (1) on whether he or she has decision making capacity to give consent to sexual activity and (2) for developmentally appropriate sex education materials and resources. Provides that as part of the assessments, consideration shall be given to medical, psychological, and psycho-social evaluations. Provides that the person's decision making capacity to consent to sexual activity and the developmentally appropriate sex education materials and resources shall be determined by the treatment team that includes the individual, professionals who have knowledge of the individual, and the individual's guardian, if appointed. Guardian decision making shall be made in accordance with the court order of appointment and the standards of decision making established by the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall approve course material in sex education. Establishes standards for the course materials and instruction. Defines "healthy sexual practices".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDD CD-DD SEX EDUCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0506
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-002-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-042-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-13HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Charles Meier
2019-03-13HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Charles Meier
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-007-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40554-211New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback