IL HB3295 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if House Bill 3653 of the 101st General Assembly, as amended by Senate Amendment No. 2, becomes law, amends the Crime Victims Compensation Act. Changes the dates of application to January 1, 2022 from January 1, 2021 in provisions amending the Crime Victims Compensation Act in House Bill 3653, as amended by Senate Amendment No. 2. Provides that a victim's criminal history or felony status shall not automatically prevent compensation to that victim or the victim's family. Extends the applicant's period for submitting requested information to 45 days (from 30 days). Provides that a final award shall not exceed $45,000 (instead of $27,000) for a crime committed on or after August 7, 2022. Provides that emergency awards may be issued to the applicant for the purpose of paying funeral and burial expenses. Clarifies references to the responsibilities of the Attorney General. Makes grammatical and technical changes. Effective immediately, except for certain provisions that are effective January 1, 2022.
Title
CRIME VICTIMS COMPENSATION
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Special Session in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Special Session in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0027 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022; - Other provisions. |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-001-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-040-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 45 | 10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 12.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 45 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |