IL HB3293 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that, for all contracts entered into on or after July 1, 2022, a primary contractor making or taking a contract in the State for the erection, construction, alteration, or repair of a building, structure, or other private work in the State shall assume, and is liable for, any debt owed to a wage claimant incurred pursuant to the Act by a subcontractor at any tier acting under, by, or for the primary contractor for the wage claimant's performance of labor included in the subject of the contract between the primary contractor and the owner. Provides exemption from liability for a property owner who acts as a primary contractor related to the erection, construction, alteration, or repair of his or her primary residence where the aggregate costs of the project amounts to less than $100,000. Defines terms. Provides that the primary contractor's liability under the new provisions shall extend only to any unpaid wages, including interest owed and reasonable attorney's fees, but shall not extend to wage supplements, penalties, or liquidated damages. Provides that a primary contractor or any other person shall not evade or commit any act that negates the requirements of the new provisions. Provides that the obligations and remedies provided in the new provisions shall be in addition to any obligations and remedies otherwise provided by law, except that nothing in the new provisions shall be construed to impose liability on a primary contractor for anything other than unpaid wages, interest owed and reasonable attorney's fees. Provides that claims brought pursuant to the new provisions shall be done so in accordance with provisions concerning violations of the Act.
Title
WKR COMP COMM SALARIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-10-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-017-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Verified |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4a-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4a-6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4a-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |