IL HB3292 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a person to knowingly coercively control another person without the other person's consent. Defines "coercive control". Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor and provides for enhancements for multiple violations of the Section and for convictions of previous crimes. Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 and Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Adds a definition of "coercive control" and adds coercive control to the definition of "abuse".
Title
CRIM CD-COERCIVE CONTROL
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3292&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3292.htm |