IL HB3289 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each chief county assessment officer may approve a homestead exemption for the 2021 taxable year, without application, for any property that was approved for the exemption for the 2020 taxable year, if: (1) the county board has declared a local disaster as provided in the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act related to the COVID-19 public health emergency; (2) the owner of record of the property as of January 1, 2021 is the same as the owner of record of the property as of January 1, 2020; (3) the exemption for the 2020 taxable year has not been determined to be an erroneous exemption as defined by the Code; and (4) the taxpayer for the 2020 taxable year has not asked for the exemption to be removed for the 2020 or 2021 taxable years. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0136 |
2021-07-23 | House | Effective Date July 23, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |