IL HB3285 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 in relation to child pornography. Provides that a person also commits the offense of child pornography when he or she knowingly films, videotapes, photographs, or otherwise depicts or portrays by means of any similar visual medium or reproduction or depicts by computer any actual or simulated act of criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse involving any child whom he or she knows or reasonably should know to be under the age of 18 or any severely or profoundly mentally retarded person, or knowingly possesses such film, videotape, photograph, or other depiction by computer. Provides that a violation is a Class X felony for which the defendant shall be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 9 years and not more than 40 years.
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD PORNOGRAPHY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 25, 2011 |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 005-000-000 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |