IL HB3281 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code to require a high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction about the process of naturalization by which a foreign citizen or foreign national becomes a U.S. citizen. Provides that the course of instruction shall include content from the components of the naturalization test administered by the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Provides that each school board shall determine the minimum amount of instructional time required. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-NATURALIZATION TEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0472 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |