IL HB3279 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the maximum liability of a renter of a vehicle for damages resulting from loss due to theft of the vehicle from $2,000 to the actual and reasonable costs incurred up to the fair market value of the vehicle immediately before the loss occurred, as calculated by a commonly and commercially accepted method to establish a fair market value. Provides that a renter who loses or otherwise fails to secure the keys of a rented motor vehicle shall be liable for any damage to the vehicle as a result of the failure or, if the vehicle is not returned to the person, its fair market value immediately before the loss occurred.
Title
VEH CD-RENTAL CAR INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-305.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3279&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3279.htm |