IL HB3274 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Requires the Department on Aging, the Department of Human Services, and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to identify all programs operating in the State, both public and private, that provide services to meet the unique needs and circumstances of senior citizens. Requires the Department on Aging to compile and maintain a list of the identified programs that includes for each program listed: (i) a brief description of program services; (ii) eligibility requirements; and (ii) instructions on how to apply to the program. Requires the Department on Aging and the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services to post the list of identified programs on their websites in a relevant and conspicuous place. Requires the Department on Aging to ensure that printed copies of the list of identified programs are available for distribution to senior citizens at each local agency that contracts with a designated area agency on aging. Requires the Secretary of State to ensure that printed copies of the list of identified programs are available for distribution to senior citizens at each driver services facility operated by the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-SENIOR SERVICES LISTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.17New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback