IL HB3274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Fair Act. Provides that income derived from the sale of advertising at the DuQuoin State Fair shall be deposited into the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all revenues from the operation and use of any facilities at the DuQuoin State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fairgrounds shall be deposited in the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all funds in the Illinois State Fair Fund shall be used by the Department of Agriculture in accordance with appropriation by the General Assembly for operation of the Illinois State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fair (rather than solely the Illinois State Fair). Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGRICULTURE-STATE FAIRS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021010Amended CodeCitation Text
202106Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback