IL HB3272 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that all trout, including lake trout, salmon, and lake whitefish may not be taken by commercial fishing devices, including gill or pound nets. Provides that any incidental catch of trout, including lake trout, salmon, and lake whitefish taken in legal sized gill or pound nets must be returned immediately to the water. Provides that the methods of taking are subject to modification by administrative rule based upon lake-wide scientific assessment data or fishery management need. Repeals a Section concerning commercial fishing.
Title
COMMERCIAL FISHING REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0168 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 15-30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |