IL HB3270 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Increases from $200 to $500 the minimum base penalty for transacting business in this State without authority. Provides that a corporation that effects a change in the number of issued shares or the amount of paid-in capital prior to January 1, 2020, rather than effecting a change at any time, shall file a report regarding the issued shares or paid-in capital. Provides that franchise taxes are not payable on or after January 1, 2020. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, a corporation that fails to file an annual report shall pay a penalty of $50 plus $10 per month or part of a month that the report is delinquent.
Title
CORPORATIONS-FRANCHISE TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 5 | 13.70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 14.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 15.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 15.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 15.97 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 16.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3270&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3270.htm |