IL HB3257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Charter Schools Article of the School Code. Removes provisions providing that the total number of charter schools operating under this Article at any one time shall not exceed 120. Removes a provision limiting the number of charter schools to 70 in any city having a population exceeding 500,000. Removes a provision limiting the number of charter schools to 45 in the remainder of the State. Removes a provision providing that the State Board of Education shall assign a number to each charter submission it receives for its review and certification, based on the chronological order in which the submission is received by it.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CHARTER SCH LIMIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527A-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback