IL HB3253 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Drug Treatment Act. Provides that the drug court treatment program may also, subject to the approval of the Chief Judge of the Circuit, establish a program for electronic monitoring of juveniles with regard to drug-related and alcohol-related offenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV DRUG CT-ELEC MONITORING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70541040New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback