IL HB3251 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of illegal electronic monitoring in the statute concerning cyberstalking. Provides that a person commits illegal electronic monitoring when he or she knowingly installs, conceals, or otherwise places an electronic tracking software or spyware on an electronic communication device without the consent of all owners and primary users of the device for the purpose of monitoring or following the user or users of the software. Provides exceptions. Provides that a first violation is a Class 4 felony and a second or subsequent conviction is a Class 3 felony. Defines "electronic communication device" and "electronic tracking software or spyware".
Title
CRIM CD-ILLEGAL ELECTRONIC MON
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0166 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 089-002-003 |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |