IL HB3248 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, with the assistance of the Department of Transportation, to conduct a study describing the environmental and human health impacts caused by runways and air traffic at Chicago O'Hare International Airport. Requires the Agency, when conducting this study, to pay particular attention to the impact of air pollution, noise pollution, the emission of gases and fluids by aircraft, and similar factors on the quality of life, health, and property values of persons who live adjacent to the flight paths used by Chicago O'Hare International Airport. Requires the Agency, with the Department's assistance, to monitor noise levels experienced in 2018 and 2019. Requires the Department to assist with the study. Requires the Agency to deliver a written report of its findings to the General Assembly by no later than October 31, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
AIRPORTS-ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0592 |
2018-06-22 | House | Effective Date June 22, 2018 |
2018-06-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-380 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |