IL HB3240 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that on or before June 30, 2018 each airport shall upgrade its permanent noise monitoring system to be capable of producing the data necessary to meet the requirements of Public Act 99-202. Provides that on June 30, 2018 and thereafter an airport's permanent noise monitoring report and noise contour maps shall be produced using the criteria under Public Act 99-202. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOISE MONITORING-REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateRe-assigned to Transportation
2017-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6203510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback