IL HB3237 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In provisions that prohibit liquor distributors and manufacturers from giving, and retail licensees from receiving, anything of value, provides that a manufacturer, distributor or importing distributor may furnish free social media advertising to a person having a retail license if the social media advertisement does not contain the retail price of any alcoholic liquor. Defines "social media". Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SOCIAL MEDIA ADVERTISE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0448 |
2015-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2015 |
2015-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-07-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-06-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-06-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-06-09 | House | House Concurs |
2015-06-09 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-06-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 087-020-000 |
2015-06-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 087-020-000 |
2015-06-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-06-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2015-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-002-000 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-042-001 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-17 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |