IL HB3235 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that 45 days prior to the scheduled discharge of a person committed to the custody of the Department of Corrections, the Department shall give the person: (1) information about obtaining a standard Illinois Identification Card or a limited-term Illinois Identification Card; (2) information about voter registration and may distribute information prepared by the State Board of Elections and may enter into an interagency contract with the State Board of Elections to participate in the automatic voter registration program and be a designated automatic voter registration agency under the Election Code; (3) information about job listings upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (4) information about available housing upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (5) a directory of elected State officials and of officials elected in the county and municipality, if any, in which the committed person intends to reside upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; and (6) any other information that the Department of Corrections deems necessary to provide the committed person in order for the committed person to reenter the community and avoid recidivism (currently, the committed person is provided information, if uninsured, about applying for health care coverage including medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-RELEASEE-REENTRY INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-009-000
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-042-000
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-14-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback