IL HB3235 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Lowers penalties for the manufacture, delivery, possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, and trafficking and possession of cannabis, controlled substances, and methamphetamine. Eliminates mandatory sentences of imprisonment for the manufacture, delivery, possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, and trafficking and possession of these drugs. Eliminates extended term sentences, habitual criminal status, and Class X sentencing for violations of the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act.
Title
DRUG OFFENSES-PENALTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3235&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3235.htm |