IL HB3234 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Historical Library Act. Provides that selected past editions of newspapers of this State that are preserved under a program within the Lincoln Presidential Library shall be preserved in accordance with industry standards (rather than being microphotographed). Provides that, upon payment of the required fee, any person or organization shall be granted access to the preserved edition (rather than being supplied with prints requested to be made from the negatives of the microphotographs). Provides that the required fee shall be determined by the State Historian and shall be equal to the cost incurred by the Lincoln Presidential Library in granting such access (rather than the cost of supplying the prints). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LINCOLN PRES LIBRARY-NEWSPAPER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0164
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2034255.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback