IL HB3234 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that any person may use a crossbow to take coyotes during any coyote season. Effective immediately.
Title
CROSSBOW HUNTING-COYOTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0307 |
2015-08-07 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-003-000 |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-003-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2015-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 007-000-000 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-013-001 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |