IL HB3231 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no person may knowingly beat, cruelly treat, torment, starve, overwork, or otherwise abuse any companion animal in the presence of a minor. Provides that any person convicted of this violation shall be subject to a fine of $250 and ordered to perform community service for not less than 200 hours, if community service is available in the jurisdiction, in addition to any other authorized penalties. Provides that, at the discretion of the court, a defendant convicted of this offense shall be liable for the cost of any counseling required for the minor.
Title
ANIMAL CRUELTY-MINOR PRESENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0357 |
2015-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-03-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |