IL HB3230 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law of the Property Tax Code. Provides that a resident of a county that is not subject to the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law may file a petition for a referendum (currently, only the county board by resolution or ordinance) to the voters of the county on the question of whether to make all non-home rule taxing districts that have all or a portion of their equalized assessed valuation situated in the county subject to the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law. Provides petition requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-VOTER REFERENDUM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-213Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback