IL HB3229 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Agriculture for the purpose of making grants to socially-disadvantaged farmers to provide funding for startup capital and for costs associated with farming operations and equipment. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$AGR-DISADVANTAGED FARMER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-03-02 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3229&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB3229.pdf |