IL HB3223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance must provide coverage for medically necessary preventative physical therapy for insureds diagnosed with multiple sclerosis without any treatment limitation or calendar year maximum. Removes requirements that coverage under this provision be subject to the same waiting period, cost sharing limitation, treatment limitation, calendar year maximum, or other limitation as provided for other physical or rehabilitative therapy benefits.
Title
INS CD-MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Insurance |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 9, 2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 8, 2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-035-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-29 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-007-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |