IL HB3223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance must provide coverage for medically necessary preventative physical therapy for insureds diagnosed with multiple sclerosis without any treatment limitation or calendar year maximum. Removes requirements that coverage under this provision be subject to the same waiting period, cost sharing limitation, treatment limitation, calendar year maximum, or other limitation as provided for other physical or rehabilitative therapy benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-035-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-007-000
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback