IL HB3222 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services to grant and convey a permanent conservation easement to the Chicago Park District. Repeals a provision in Public Act 94-653 regarding the legal description of the land. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to terminate all contractual interests of the State of Illinois provided in the agreement between the State and the City of Pana, made on June 28, 1949, for the purpose of funding the construction of a dam and water reservoir to create the Pana Lake Project. Provides that the State of Illinois shall not receive compensation for the termination of its contractual rights. Provides that the Director shall execute a mutual termination with the City of Pana terminating both parties' interests in the agreement. Authorizes the Director to execute and deliver a quitclaim deed concerning specified real property to the Forest Preserve District of Will County for $1. Authorizes and directs the Illinois Medical District Commission to execute and deliver a quitclaim deed for specified real property to the Julie and Michael Tracy Family Foundation. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS LAND TRANSFER
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Walker [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 113-001-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 113-001-000 |
2019-05-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 4 |
2019-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Aquino |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |