IL HB3222 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules may (rather than shall) evaluate the rules of each agency at its discretion (currently, at least once every 5 years). Provides that when the Joint Committee determines that it will conduct a review of existing rules, it will publish in the Illinois Register and on its website an announcement of the commencement of that review and list the subject matter of the rules to be reviewed. Modifies the meanings of the term "rule" and "emergency" under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JCAR-RULE REVIEW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-005-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-046-000
2017-03-30HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-03-28HousePension Note Filed
2017-03-28HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-03-28HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-03-28HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-03-28HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-70Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-130Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback