IL HB3219 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that beginning not less than 2 years, but no more than 3 years, after the effective date of this amendatory Act, and for every even-numbered year thereafter, the Illinois Labor Relations Board shall conduct an election to certify the majority representative of the employees as the exclusive bargaining representative for the unit of employees. Provides further procedures and certification requirements for an election to select an exclusive bargaining representative. Provides that an election may be directed by the Board in any bargaining unit where there is in force a valid collective bargaining agreement, but requires that the terms of any pre-existing agreement between the prior exclusive representative and the public employer shall continue in effect for the remaining contract term, except for certain provisions involving the exclusive representative. Provides that no multi-year collective bargaining agreement entered into after the effective date of this amendatory Act shall be longer than 5 years in duration. Removes provisions allowing the board to designate an exclusive representative by means other than an election. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act to make similar changes. Modifies the term "exclusive representative". Makes other conforming changes.
Title
LABOR RELATIONS-REP ELECTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | To Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3219&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3219.htm |