IL HB3216 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that for the purpose of issuing an identification card or driver's license with a veteran designation, acceptable forms of proof shall include, among other documents, Department of Defense form DD-2 (Retired) or a United States Department of Veterans Affairs summary of benefits letter. Provides new requirements for verification of veteran status. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VETERAN-ID AND DRIVERS LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0106 |
2019-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |