IL HB3215 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Securing All Futures for Equitable Reinvestment in Communities Act. Provides legislative intent. Creates the Securing All Futures for Equitable Reinvestment Tax Credit Pilot Program Act. Provides that an applicant that hires certain formerly incarcerated individuals during the incentive period may apply for a tax credit against the applicant's withholding tax liability. Provides that the savings from the changes made to the Unified Code of Corrections shall be deposited into the Securing All Futures for Equitable Reinvestment (SAFER) Communities Fund for the purpose of funding the program. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to reduce the sentencing ranges for all classes of felonies, and to remove minimum sentences for Class 4 felonies and Class A and Class B misdemeanors. Provides that the provisions of the Act apply to offenses committed before the effective date of this Act, and to offenses committed on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Provides for resentencing of currently incarcerated persons based on these changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REENTRY INTO THE WORKFORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-04-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-04-15HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text
355704AAmended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-120New CodeSee Bill Text
73055-4.5-25Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-30Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-35Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-40Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-45Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-50Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-85Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-95Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback