IL HB3212 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emancipation of Minors Act. Removes language pertaining to homeless minors from provisions governing: purpose and policy; jurisdiction; rights and responsibilities of an emancipated minor; petitions; and hearings. Repeals the definition of "homeless minor" and "youth transitional housing program". Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that services provided by youth transitional housing programs may include a service assessment, individualized case management, and life skills training. Provides that a homeless minor is eligible if certain criteria are met. Provides that if a homeless minor voluntarily leaves or is dismissed from a youth transitional housing program prior to reaching the age of majority, the youth transitional housing program agency shall contact the comprehensive community based youth services agency that provided crisis intervention services to the eligible homeless minor to assist in finding an alternative placement for the minor. Provides that nothing in the new provisions shall be construed to require an eligible homeless minor to acquire the consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian to consent to a youth transitional housing program. Provides that an eligible homeless minor is deemed to have the legal capacity to consent to receiving housing and services from a licensed youth transitional housing program. Contains a statement of purpose.
Title
HOMELESS MINOR-CONSENT;HOUSING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0162 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-040-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-07 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-01 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-24 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-24 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 3-2.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 3-2.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 30 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |