IL HB3210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Provides that except in the case of a medical emergency, no physician or person shall knowingly perform, induce, or attempt to perform an abortion upon a pregnant woman when the probable gestational age of her unborn child has been determined to be at least 20 weeks. Provides that a woman upon whom an abortion in violation of the Act is performed or induced may not be prosecuted under the Act for a conspiracy to violate the 20 week requirement. Provides that the woman, the father of the unborn child if married to the mother at the time she receives an abortion in violation of the Act, or, if the mother has not attained the age of 18 years at the time of the abortion, or both, the maternal grandparents of the unborn child, may in a civil action obtain appropriate relief, unless the pregnancy resulted from the plaintiff's criminal conduct or, if brought by the maternal grandparents, the maternal grandparents consented to the abortion. Provides that a medical facility licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act or the Hospital Licensing Act in which an abortion is performed or induced in violation of the Act shall be subject to immediate revocation of its license by the Department of Public Health. Provides that a medical facility licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act or the Hospital Licensing Act in which an abortion is performed or induced in violation of the Act shall lose all State funding for 2 years and shall reimburse the State for moneys or grants received from the State by the medical facility for the fiscal year in which the abortion in violation of the Act was performed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION LAW-UNDER 20 WEEKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommitee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7205101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
7205101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
72051010Amended CodeCitation Text
72051011.2New CodeSee Bill Text
72051011.3New CodeSee Bill Text
72051011.4New CodeSee Bill Text
72051011.5New CodeSee Bill Text
72051014Amended CodeCitation Text
7205102Amended CodeCitation Text
7205105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback