IL HB3204 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall, on an annual basis, establish one deer hunting weekend for persons with disabilities in a manner consistent with the provisions of the Code. Provides that the Department may adopt administrative rules to implement the provision. Defines "person with a disability."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-DISABLED PERSON-HUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.28-5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback