IL HB3202 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Adds e-cigarettes and other vapor devices as one of the educational areas the Comprehensive Health Education Program must include. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH ED-E-CIGARETTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0464 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |