IL HB3190 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a Section of School Code concerning pupil residency. Provides that, for school districts having a population of less than 500,000, if a person attempts to enroll a pupil in a school district and the school board finds that the pupil is a non-resident of that district, the board must provide certain information to the person attempting to enroll the pupil, including referrals to free or reduced-cost legal help. Provides that, at a hearing to decide the issue of residency, the board has the burden of going forward with the evidence concerning the pupil's residency. Provides that if the school board determines the pupil is a non-resident, the person attempting to enroll the pupil may petition the regional superintendent of schools to review the decision. Establishes the procedure and timeframe for the petition. Provides that, for school districts having a population of 500,000 or more, if the board of education finds that a pupil enrolled in the school district is a nonresident of that district and that decision is under appeal, the pupil may, at the request of the person who enrolled the pupil, enroll and attend school without payment of tuition pending a final decision of the board of education. Provides that if the board of education finds that the pupil is a non-resident of the district after the hearing, the board shall refuse to permit the pupil to continue attending the schools of the district unless the required tuition is paid. Provides that references to days in the Section refer to calendar days. Makes other changes.
Title
SCH CD-RESIDENCY DETERMINATION
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-008 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-001 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 025-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-001-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |