IL HB3190 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2014, upon entering the 7th and 12th grade of any public, private, or parochial school, a student shall present to the school proof of having received an immunization containing meningococcal conjugate vaccine. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt a rule requiring students, upon entering the 7th and 12th grade of any public, private, or parochial school, to receive an immunization containing meningococcal conjugate vaccine beginning July 1, 2014.
Title
SCHOOLS-MENINGOCOCCAL VACCINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0480 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 4, 5 |
2013-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 005-003-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 315 | 1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |