IL HB3188 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the David A. Wirsing Food Animal Institute Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FOOD ANIMAL INSTITUTE ACT REP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0116 |
2017-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2017 |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3931 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |