IL HB3185 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Universities Civil Service Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning temporary appointments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-06-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-23HouseRe-assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1107036mAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback