IL HB3183 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that all law enforcement agencies shall notify the Board of any final determination of willful violation of department or agency policy, official misconduct, or violation of law when the officer is disciplined. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that when a petition is filed alleging that the State's Attorney is sick, absent, or unable to fulfill his or her duties seeking the appointment of some competent attorney to prosecute or defend the cause or proceeding, the court shall (rather than consider the petition, any documents filed in response, and if necessary,) grant a hearing to determine whether the State's Attorney is sick, absent, or otherwise unable to fulfill his or her duties. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Changes the standards for peace officer use of deadly force. Expands official misconduct to include an officer filing false police reports or failing to turn on or turning off an officer-worn body camera. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide educational and visitation opportunities to committed persons within its institutions through temporary access to content-controlled tablets that may be provided as a privilege to committed persons to induce or reward compliance. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM LAW-POLICE CONDUCT; MSR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 33-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 7-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3183&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3183.htm |